Harris v. Livers et al
Plaintiff: Devontae C Harris
Defendant: Dorothy Livers, Wilkinson, Michelle Rebac and Dr Pearcy
Not Classified By Court: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00580
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 5.95, receipt number 3025281 (jld)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) filed by Devontae C Harris. The Court ORDERS the plaintiff, Devontae C. Harris, IDOC # 228884, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $5.95 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/4/20. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(ksp)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Devontae C Harris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kms)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Devontae C Harris. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (kms)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from Devontae Harris re: filing fee (jld)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING the clerk to write this cause number on a blank Prisoner Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis AO 240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) and send it to Devontae C. Harris; GRANTING Devontae C. Harris until 8/14/2020, to either pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis motion accompanied by his trust fund ledgers for the past six months; and CAUTIONING Devontae C. Harris that, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/14/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form)(bas)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Dorothy Livers, Dr Pearcy, Michelle Rebac, Wilkinson, filed by Devontae C Harris.(No filing fee or IFP received) (Returned file stamped copy with case number to Harris) (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope)(nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Livers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Livers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Rebac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Pearcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devontae C Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?