BelAir Electronics Inc v. Carved Inc
Plaintiff: BelAir Electronics Inc
Defendant: Carved Inc and Carved LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00630
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 41 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for all of BelAir's claims against Carved; and WITHOUT PREJUDICE for all of Carved's counterclaims against BelAir pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the #30 Stipulation to Dismiss. (jss)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss by Plaintiff BelAir Electronics Inc, Counter Defendant BelAir Electronics Inc. (Haller PHV, Timothy)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The parties have notified the Court that this matter has settled. Therefore the 6/9/2021 R16B hearing is VACATED, and the Court SETS the deadline for filing dismissal papers for 7/9/2021. Text only entry by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 6/8/2021. (jss)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Haller PHV, Timothy)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 5/27/2021. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2021 11:00 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/7/21. (slm)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 BelAir Electronics, Inc.'s ANSWER to #23 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Defendant Carved LLC by BelAir Electronics Inc.(Haller PHV, Timothy)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #16 MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to FRCP 11 by Defendant Carved LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 5/7/2021. (lhc)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against BelAir Electronics Inc by Carved LLC.(Handy PHV, John)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Defendant Carved LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 4/2/2021. (lhc)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to FRCP 11 filed by Carved LLC. (Handy PHV, John)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gabriel I Opatken PHV for BelAir Electronics Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/13/2021. (ace)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Application for Attorney Gabriel I. Opatken to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of BelAir Electronics, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4448700 (Attachments: #1 COGS and List of Federal Courts Admitted To)(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to FRCP 11 filed by BelAir Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy J. Haller, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Haller PHV, Timothy)
December 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of #16 MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to FRCP 11 filed by Carved LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Handy PHV, John)
December 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to FRCP 11 by Defendant Carved LLC. (Handy PHV, John)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) BelAir's Sur-Reply for the Court's Consideration filed by BelAir Electronics Inc. (Haller PHV, Timothy)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Carved LLC. (Handy PHV, John)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by BelAir Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy J. Haller, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Haller PHV, Timothy)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BelAir Electronics Inc. (Haller PHV, Timothy)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carved LLC. (Handy PHV, John)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Carved LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A US7,941,195, #2 Exhibit B US10,097,676)(Handy PHV, John)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Defendant Carved LLC. (Handy PHV, John)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John E Handy PHV for Carved LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/9/2020. (ace)
September 7, 2020 Filing 7 Application for Attorney John E. Handy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Carved, LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4333815(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BelAir Electronics Inc. Carved LLC waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Haller PHV, Timothy)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Carved LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kms)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Timothy J Haller PHV for BelAir Electronics Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/30/2020. (ace)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Attorney Timothy J. Haller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of BelAir Electronics Inc ; Pro Hac Vice fee of $96.00 received, receipt #3025120. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kms)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark - AO Form 120 by BelAir Electronics Inc. AO Form 120 submitted to Patent/Trademark Office. (kms)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement with Jury Demand against Carved Inc (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt #3025121), filed by BelAir Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Envelope)(kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BelAir Electronics Inc v. Carved Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BelAir Electronics Inc
Represented By: Timothy J Haller
Represented By: Timothy J Haller PHV
Represented By: Gabriel I Opatken PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carved Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carved LLC
Represented By: John E Handy PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?