Kieffer v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Kieffer
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00653
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of Thor Motor Coach Inc (Gasper, Trevor)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00120. Original file and docket sheet received.
July 31, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #11 ) (sac, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 8/4/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Defendant's motion to transfer (Doc. 10) is granted. The Clerk of Court is instructed to transfer this case to the Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division. ; transferring case (terminates case) ; granting #10 Motion to Transfer Case to Other District (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) (SAS, Chambers) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 8/4/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District Based on Enforceable Forum-Selection Clause Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) and Brief in Support by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (With attachments) (Arnold, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 8/4/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Arnold, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 8/4/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John W Arnold on behalf of Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Arnold, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 8/4/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Amanda L Clark (sc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 8/4/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Thor Motor Coach, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 8/4/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Thor Industries, Inc. for Thor Motor Coach, Inc.) by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Blassingame, Johnny) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 8/4/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Blassingame, Johnny) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 8/4/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Creek County, case number CJ-2020-63 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2189119) by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (With attachments) (Blassingame, Johnny) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 8/4/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Johnny Rex Blassingame on behalf of Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Blassingame, Johnny) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 8/4/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (With attachments) (Blassingame, Johnny) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 8/4/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Thor Motor Coach Inc, filed by Robert Kieffer.(jld)
February 24, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Thor Motor Coach, Inc. by Robert Kieffer (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 3/25/2020 to correct spelling of party name(sc, Dpty Clk). [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 8/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kieffer v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kieffer
Represented By: Amanda L Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach Inc
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: John W Arnold
Represented By: Johnny Rex Blassingame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?