Chwalek v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Marisa A Chwalek
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00667
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Marisa A Chwalek. U.S. Attorney General served on 8/25/2020, IRS served on 8/24/2020. (rmc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Marisa A Chwalek. U.S. Attorney served on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (rmc)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS) (lhc)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVING the filing fee; and DIRECTING, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 8/11/2020. (cc: USMS) (lhc)
August 10, 2020 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE; Motion pending. (jat)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Marisa A Chwalek. (Thomas, Patrick)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against United States of America, filed by Marisa A Chwalek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Thomas, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chwalek v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisa A Chwalek
Represented By: Patrick W Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?