Brown et al v. Scalise
Plaintiff: Gerry E. Brown, David Broitman, As Successor Trustee Of The Fred Broitman Living Trust Agreement Dated January 30, 1996, Deborah Sullivan Brown and David Broitman, As Successor Trustee Of The Fred Broitman Living Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated January 30, 1996
Defendant: Rosario Scalise
Case Number: 3:2020cv00680
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Rosario Scalise; answer due by 10/15/2020. (lhc)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Rosario Scalise ; answer due by 10/15/2020. (Hagenow, Matthew)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Hagenow on behalf of Rosario Scalise (Hagenow, Matthew)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint. Rosario Scalise served on 8/27/20, answer due 9/17/20. (Quinn, Sean) Modified on 9/2/2020 to update docket text. (nal)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rosario Scalise. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf)
August 17, 2020 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (rmf)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean J Quinn on behalf of Deborah Sullivan Brown, Gerry E. Brown, David Broitman, As Successor Trustee Of The Fred Broitman Living Trust Agreement Dated January 30, 1996 (Quinn, Sean)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rosario Scalise( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4311932.), filed by Deborah Sullivan Brown, David Broitman, As Successor Trustee Of The Fred Broitman Living Trust Agreement Dated January 30, 1996, Gerry E. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Quinn, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Scalise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry E. Brown
Represented By: Sean J Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Broitman, As Successor Trustee Of The Fred Broitman Living Trust Agreement Dated January 30, 1996
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Sullivan Brown
Represented By: Sean J Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Broitman, As Successor Trustee Of The Fred Broitman Living Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated January 30, 1996
Represented By: Sean J Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosario Scalise
Represented By: Matthew J Hagenow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?