Pruden v Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: HEATHER M. PRUDEN and Heather M Pruden
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00683
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FULL CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is fully consented to Magistrate Judge Joshua P. Kolar. (kms)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE: Counsel for Heather M. Pruden was directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #8 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. As required by General Order 2020-27, shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Counsel also advised of 10-day consent deadline by phone. (kms)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Heather M Pruden. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/8/2020. U.S. Attorney General served on 9/8/2020. U.S. Attorney served on 9/10/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (rmc)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 10/2/2020. (tc)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (rmf)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 , WAIVES payment of the filing fee, and DIRECTS the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/20/2020. (Sent to USM) (rmf)
August 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. NEW CASE; Motion pending. (jat)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R Wambach on behalf of HEATHER M. PRUDEN (Wambach, Joseph)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew F Richter on behalf of HEATHER M. PRUDEN (Richter, Matthew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff HEATHER M. PRUDEN. (Richter, Matthew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by HEATHER M. PRUDEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney General, #3 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney N.D. IND, #4 Proposed Summons SSA OGC, #5 USM 285- U.S. Attorney General, #6 USM 285- U.S. Attorney N.D. IND, #7 USM 285- SSA OGC)(Richter, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pruden v Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER M. PRUDEN
Represented By: Joseph R Wambach
Represented By: Matthew F Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather M Pruden
Represented By: Joseph R Wambach
Represented By: Matthew F Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?