Williams v. Wexford Medical Inc et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Tracy Williams
Defendant: Wexford Medical Inc, Westville Correctional Facility and Wexford Medical
Not Classified By Court: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00690
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. (mlc)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached), by Plaintiff Stephen Tracy Williams. (mrm)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Stephen Tracy Williams. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rmc)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The court DENIES the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 with leave to refile; DIRECTS the clerk to place this cause number on a blank Prisoner Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis AO 240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) and send it to the plaintiff; GRANTS the plaintiff until 9/22/2020, to return the form properly completed and accompanied by his trust fund ledgers for the past six months; and CAUTIONS him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case is subject to dismissal without further notice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/20/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form)(bas)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Stephen Tracy Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Indigency)(kms)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Westville Correctional Facility, Wexford Medical Inc, filed by Stephen Tracy Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(File stamped copy with case number returned to Williams)(kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Wexford Medical Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Tracy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westville Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?