Grant v. Indiana Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Brian Lynn Grant
Defendant: Indiana Department of Corrections and Wexford Medical
Not Classified By Court: MIAMI E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00694
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERING the plaintiff, Brian Lynn Grant, IDOC # 109134, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $18.08 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING the plaintiff to pay to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTING the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/24/2020. (Copy mailed to Inmate Trust Dept., Miami Correctional) (lhc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Docket sheet and file stamped copy of DE #2 to be distributed to Brian Lynn Grant #109134. (Attachments: #1 File stamped copy of Complaint)(kms) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2020: #2 corrected copy of complaint) (nae).
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Brian Lynn Grant. (kms)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Indiana Department of Corrections, Wexford Medical, filed by Brian Lynn Grant. (File stamped copy with case number sent to Grant)(kms)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Brian Lynn Grant. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Indiana Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lynn Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MIAMI E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?