Tiller v. Talbot et al
Plaintiff: Frank Tiller
Defendant: Merandat, Paul Talbot, Zatecky, Kim Myers, Hyett, Lee Ann, Ms Ivers, Lynn Fry, Wexford Medical, Keenzly, LeeAnn Ivers and Wexford
Case Number: 3:2020cv00700
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lynn Fry, Ivers, Merandat, Wexford Medical, Keenzly, filed by Frank Tiller. (Received without case number)(nae)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint. Any amendments to the pleadings to be filed by 12/10/2020. Frank Tiller is cautioned if he does not respond by the deadline this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/8/20. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mlc)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time and Why by Plaintiff Frank Tiller. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rmc)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION AND ORDER: Frank Tiller is granted until 9/30/2020, to file an amended complaint on the proper form. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/28/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-01164. Original file and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana, on 8/18/2020. (JDC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 CLOSED TRANSFER to Northern District of Indiana. All claims arising out of Mr. Tiller's medical treatment while he was incarcerated at Pendleton Correctional Facility are barred by the statute of limitations and are now dismissed. Any remaining claims occurred in the Northern District of Indiana. Accordingly, for the convenience of parties and witnesses and in the interest of justice, this action is now transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division. (Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 8/18/2020.(JDC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 Correspondence REQUESTING COPY of Case Docket Sheet. Copy/Copies provided via US Mail. (Attachments: #1 public docket sheet) (JDC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 RECEIPT #NA004269 for Filing fee in the amount of $400.00, paid by Miami Correctional Facility for Frank Tiller. (LBT) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by FRANK TILLER. (JDC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through May 20, 2020, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LYNN FRY, HYETT, IVERS, LEE ANN, MERANDAT, KIM MYERS, PAUL TALBOT, WEXFORD MEDICAL, ZATECKY, filed by FRANK TILLER. (No fee paid with this filing). (AKH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiller v. Talbot et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merandat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zatecky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Ann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Ivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keenzly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeeAnn Ivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Tiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?