R&B Car Company, Inc. et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Brandon Cretacci, R&B Car Company, Inc., Ricci Moore and Daniel Green
Defendant: United States of America Dept of Treasury
Case Number: 3:2020cv00701
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7426
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricci Moore. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Groves, James)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy J Grogg on behalf of Brandon Cretacci, Daniel Green, R&B Car Company, Inc. (Grogg, Jeremy)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States of America Dept of Treasury. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (bas)
August 19, 2020 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (bas)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons filed by Ricci Moore. (Groves, James)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by Ricci Moore. (Groves, James)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by Ricci Moore. (Groves, James)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James F Groves on behalf of Ricci Moore (Groves, James)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4316593.), filed by Ricci Moore, R&B Car Company, Inc, Brandon Cretacci, Daniel Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Groves, James) Modified on 8/21/2020 (bas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R&B Car Company, Inc. et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Dept of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Cretacci
Represented By: Jeremy J Grogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R&B Car Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy J Grogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricci Moore
Represented By: James F Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Green
Represented By: Jeremy J Grogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?