First Allied Securities, Inc. v. Albert J Brasseur Jr
Plaintiff: First Allied Securities, Inc.
Defendant: Albert J Brasseur, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00810
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal STIPULATION re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff First Allied Securities, Inc.. (McLaughlin, Rafael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Allied Securities, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Aretec Group, Inc. for First Allied Securities, Inc... (McLaughlin, Rafael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Albert J Brasseur, Jr. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
September 28, 2020 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. MOTIONS FOR TRO AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION PENDING. (kjp)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by First Allied Securities, Inc.. (McLaughlin, Rafael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff First Allied Securities, Inc.. (McLaughlin, Rafael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rafael P McLaughlin on behalf of First Allied Securities, Inc. (McLaughlin, Rafael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Immediate Injunction and Declaratory Relief against Albert J Brasseur, Jr.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4353306.), filed by First Allied Securities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(McLaughlin, Rafael) Modified on 9/25/2020 to correct docket text(nae). Modified docket text on 9/28/2020 (kjp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Allied Securities, Inc. v. Albert J Brasseur Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert J Brasseur, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Allied Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Rafael P McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?