Norfolk Southern Railway Company v. Phenix Farms, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Defendant: Randal E Plummer and Phenix Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00951
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The court orders corporate defendants to file disclosure statements under FRCP 7.1 within 7 days. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 1/6/21. (dk)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Phenix Farms, Inc., Randal E Plummer.(Raman, Barath)
December 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants answers due 1/5/21 per DE#7 . (kjp)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Phenix Farms, Inc., Randal E Plummer ; answer due by 1/5/2021. (Raman, Barath)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Trimble on behalf of All Defendants (Trimble, John)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Barath S Raman on behalf of All Defendants (Raman, Barath)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Randal E Plummer served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (Palombo, Eric)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Phenix Farms, Inc., Randal E Plummer. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jat)
November 12, 2020 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. (jat)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation for Norfolk Southern Railway Company.. (Palombo, Eric)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Phenix Farms, Inc., Randal E Plummer, filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company ($400.00, Receipt #0755-4395578. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons - Randal E. Plummer, #3 Proposed Summons directed to Phenix Farms)(Palombo, Eric) Modified on 11/10/2020 to add receipt #(rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norfolk Southern Railway Company v. Phenix Farms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randal E Plummer
Represented By: Barath S Raman
Represented By: John C Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Barath S Raman
Represented By: John C Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Eric C Palombo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?