Gaston v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Sherri Gaston
Defendant: Speedway LLC d/b/a Speedway and Speedway LLC doing business as Speedway
Case Number: 3:2020cv00963
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: This Court now ADOPTS the parties discovery plan and establishes the following deadlines: The last date to amend the pleadings without leave of court as to plaintiff is 2/1/2021; as to defendant is 3/1/2021. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 3/1/2021, Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 4/16/2021. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial.The last date for the completion of ALL DISCOVERY is 8/13/2021. The last date to file any discovery-related nondispositive motion shall be 30 days prior to the discovery deadline. Mediator Selection Deadline is 3/15/2021. Mediation to be completed by 9/30/2021. The Court hereby VACATES the Rule 16(b) Preliminary Pretrial conference scheduled for January 15, 2021 at 10:15 A.M. (EST). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/7/2021. (lhc)
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Davis, Thomas)
December 10, 2020 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 1/4/2021. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2021 10:15 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/10/20. (slm)
November 17, 2020 Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. (kjp)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal, by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Filing Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C: State Court Record: E-filing Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case; Complaint; Summons; Return of Service of Summons by Mail; E-filing Appearance by Attorneys in Civil Case (Thomas L. Davis); Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Thomas)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Other Affiliate MPC Investment LLC for Speedway LLC.. (Davis, Thomas)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L Davis on behalf of Speedway LLC (Davis, Thomas)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4399328.) from LaPorte Circuit Court, Cause No. 46C01-2010-CT-001762, filed by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Record; E-filing Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case (David A. Wilson); Complaint; Summons; Return of Service of Summons by Mail; E-filing Appearance by Attorneys in Civil Case (Thomas L. Davis); Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaston v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Gaston
Represented By: David A Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC d/b/a Speedway
Represented By: Thomas L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC doing business as Speedway
Represented By: Thomas L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?