Truitt et al v. Forest River, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carlton Whitmire, David Trupp, Lance Kuykendall, Fred Smith, Kevin Herinckx and Randy Truitt
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00964
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER finding moot #14 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney. Motion filed in wrong case. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/15/21. (slm)
January 11, 2021 Filing 14 Application for Attorney Rachel L. Schaller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Forest River, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4448259(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Main Document 14 replaced on 1/11/2021 to include signature on application) (ace). Modified on 1/11/2021 (ace).
January 7, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Joint Motion to Extend Answer/Motion to Dismiss Deadline and to Set Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule) by Defendant Forest River, Inc.. (Maley, John)
January 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alissa C Wetzel on behalf of Forest River, Inc. (Wetzel, Alissa)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark T Hayden PHV for Forest River, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/4/2021. (ace)
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Maley on behalf of Forest River, Inc. (Maley, John)
January 1, 2021 Filing 9 Application for Attorney Mark Thomas Hayden to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Forest River, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4439816(Hayden PHV, Mark)
December 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #8 Forest River Inc answer due 1/11/2021. (nae)
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Forest River, Inc. ; answer due by January 11, 2021. (Papageorge, John)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C Terrell on behalf of Forest River, Inc. (Terrell, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Forest River, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Forest River, Inc... (Papageorge, John)
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John D Papageorge on behalf of Forest River, Inc. (Papageorge, John)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Forest River, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jat)
November 18, 2020 Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. (jat)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D Gilchrist on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gilchrist, Scott)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E Shevitz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shevitz, Richard)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Forest River, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4401019.), filed by Fred Smith, David Trupp, Randy Truitt, Carlton Whitmire, Lance Kuykendall, Kevin Herinckx. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Shevitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truitt et al v. Forest River, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Represented By: Alissa C Wetzel
Represented By: John D Papageorge
Represented By: Michael C Terrell
Represented By: Mark T Hayden PHV
Represented By: John R Maley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Whitmire
Represented By: Richard E Shevitz
Represented By: Scott D Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Trupp
Represented By: Richard E Shevitz
Represented By: Scott D Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Kuykendall
Represented By: Richard E Shevitz
Represented By: Scott D Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Smith
Represented By: Richard E Shevitz
Represented By: Scott D Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Herinckx
Represented By: Richard E Shevitz
Represented By: Scott D Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Truitt
Represented By: Richard E Shevitz
Represented By: Scott D Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?