DE v Lippe et al
Plaintiff: D.E., a minor child, by his mother and next friend, Dawn Eades and DE
Defendant: DOREY MOBLEY, DR. JON LIPPE and Dr Jon Lippe
Case Number: 3:2020cv00977
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 13 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 2/5/2021. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2021 11:00 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/19/21. (slm)
January 7, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dr Jon Lippe, Dorey Mobley.(Wilkins, Eric)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court AFFIRMS the extension of Dr. Lippe's responsive pleading until 1/25/2021. The Court ADVISES the parties, through counsel, to use care to comply with the applicable Court rules going forward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/18/2020. (bas)
December 18, 2020 Answer deadline reset for Defendant Dr. Jon Lippe to 1/25/2021. (shk)
December 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M Wilkins on behalf of Dorey Mobley (Wilkins, Eric)
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DE. Dorey Mobley served on 12/17/2020, answer due 1/7/2021. (Falk, Kenneth)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DE. Dr Jon Lippe served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Falk, Kenneth)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Dr Jon Lippe ; answer due by 1/25/21. (Wilkins, Eric)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dr Jon Lippe. (Wilkins, Eric)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M Wilkins on behalf of Dr Jon Lippe (Wilkins, Eric)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dr Jon Lippe, Dorey Mobley. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
November 24, 2020 Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE and REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. (kjp)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J Falk on behalf of D.E., a minor child, by his mother and next friend, Dawn Eades (Falk, Kenneth)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4406616.), filed by D.E., a minor child, by his mother and next friend, Dawn Eades. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Falk, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DE v Lippe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOREY MOBLEY
Represented By: Eric M Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. JON LIPPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Jon Lippe
Represented By: Eric M Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.E., a minor child, by his mother and next friend, Dawn Eades
Represented By: Kenneth J Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DE
Represented By: Kenneth J Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?