Schnebelt v. Anglotopia, LLC
Plaintiff: Stefan Schnebelt
Defendant: Anglotopia, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00040
Filed: January 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Based on the #10 Notice of Settlement, the Court SETS the deadline for filing dismissal papers for 5/28/2021. Text only entry by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 3/10/2021. (jss)
March 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Stefan Schnebelt (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant to file its Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until 3/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/22/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Plaintiff Stefan Schnebelt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liebowitz, Richard)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stefan Schnebelt. Anglotopia, LLC served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STRIKING #5 Answer to Complaint filed by Anglotopia, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/12/21. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mlc)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 **STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 2/12/21** ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Anglotopia, LLC filed by pro se defendant Jonathan Thomas.(nae) Modified on 2/12/2021 to show stricken (mlc).
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 Application for Attorney EVAN CHARLES PAPPAS to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of ANGLOTOPIA, LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4480291(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Stefan Schnebelt AO 121 form (Liebowitz, Richard)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Anglotopia, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lhc)
January 19, 2021 Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. *NEW CASE* (lhc)
January 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Anglotopia, LLC( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4454900.), filed by Stefan Schnebelt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Declaration, #7 Notice)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schnebelt v. Anglotopia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefan Schnebelt
Represented By: Richard P Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anglotopia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?