Swailes II v. Keystone RV Company
Plaintiff: John T Swailes II
Defendant: Keystone RV Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00113
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Keystone RV Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bolden, Erin)
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Keystone RV Company. (Bolden, Erin)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint with Supporting Docs served on Defendant Keystone RV on 03/16/2021, filed by John T Swailes II. (Douglass, Sara)
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin Jonathan Reilly on behalf of Keystone RV Company (Reilly, Colin)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin V Bolden on behalf of Keystone RV Company (Bolden, Erin)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keystone RV Company identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries, Inc. for Keystone RV Company.. (Gasper, Trevor)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of Keystone RV Company (Gasper, Trevor)
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Keystone RV Company. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
February 18, 2021 Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4487634.), filed by John T Swailes II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B Warranty, #3 Exhibit C Repair Orders, #4 Exhibit D Written Notification, #5 Exhibit E Return Receipt, #6 Proposed Summons Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Douglass, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swailes II v. Keystone RV Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T Swailes II
Represented By: Sara Mae Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone RV Company
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Erin V Bolden
Represented By: Colin Jonathan Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?