Howell v. Flex-Tech Hose & Tubing, LLC
Plaintiff: Joetta Howell
Defendant: Flex-Tech Hose & Tubing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00244
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 6/21/2021. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2021 10:45 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/2/21. (slm)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Flex-Tech Hose & Tubing, LLC answer due 5/27/2021. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/27/21. (slm)
May 26, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flex-Tech Hose & Tubing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ETP International, Inc. for Flex-Tech Hose & Tubing, LLC.. (McLaughlin, Rafael)
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Flex-Tech Hose & Tubing, LLC.(McLaughlin, Rafael)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for Automatic Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Flex-Tech Hose & Tubing, LLC. (McLaughlin, Rafael) Modified on 4/27/2021 (bas).
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rafael P McLaughlin on behalf of All Defendants (McLaughlin, Rafael)
April 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Flex-Tech Hose & Tubing, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae)
April 12, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (nae)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Flex-Tech Hose & Tubing, LLC( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4537422.), filed by Joetta Howell. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Leary, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell v. Flex-Tech Hose & Tubing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flex-Tech Hose & Tubing, LLC
Represented By: Rafael P McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joetta Howell
Represented By: Patrick F O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?