American Home Assurance Company v. Makita Corporation et al
Plaintiff: American Home Assurance Company
Defendant: Makita Corporation of America, Makita U.S.A., Inc., Sony Energy Devices Corporation, Sony Corporation, Makita Corporation, Sony Corporation of America and Murata Manufacturing Company, Ltd
Case Number: 3:2021cv00252
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Makita Corporation, Murata Manufacturing Company, Ltd, Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Energy Devices Corporation. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
May 4, 2021 Filing 17 Proposed Summons filed by American Home Assurance Company. (Lesnick PHV, Ben)
May 4, 2021 Filing 16 Proposed Summons filed by American Home Assurance Company. (Lesnick PHV, Ben)
May 4, 2021 Filing 15 Proposed Summons filed by American Home Assurance Company. (Lesnick PHV, Ben)
May 4, 2021 Filing 14 Proposed Summons filed by American Home Assurance Company. (Lesnick PHV, Ben)
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 Proposed Summons filed by American Home Assurance Company. (Lesnick PHV, Ben)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ben C Lesnick PHV for American Home Assurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/30/2021. (ace)
April 29, 2021 Filing 11 Application for Attorney Ben C. Lesnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff American Home Assurance Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4558594(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alan B McMaster PHV for American Home Assurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/27/2021. (ace)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 Application for Attorney Alan B. McMaster to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of American Home Assurance Company a/s/o Forest River, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4553723(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
April 20, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Makita U.S.A., Inc..(Barton, Jonathan)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Makita Corporation of America.(Barton, Jonathan)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Makita Corporation of America re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Consent to Removal of Newly Served Defendant (Barton, Jonathan)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan T Barton on behalf of Makita Corporation of America, Makita U.S.A., Inc. (Barton, Jonathan)
April 14, 2021 Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. **NEW CASE** (mrm)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Makita U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Makita Coporation for Makita U.S.A., Inc... (Williams Schnelker, Jessica)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Williams Schnelker on behalf of Makita U.S.A., Inc. (Williams Schnelker, Jessica)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4541639.) from Elkhart County Superior Court, Cause No. 20D05-2103-CT-000047, filed by Makita U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - SCA Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Mohammed Al Jakoush Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D - Letter to Makita - Sony Requesting Reimbursement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit E - Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams Schnelker, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Home Assurance Company v. Makita Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makita Corporation of America
Represented By: Jonathan T Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makita U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Williams Schnelker
Represented By: Jonathan T Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Energy Devices Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makita Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murata Manufacturing Company, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: Alan B McMaster PHV
Represented By: Geoffrey D Farnham
Represented By: Ben C Lesnick PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?