Shinkle v. Wexford of Indiana LLC
Plaintiff: Darrin S Shinkle
Defendant: Wexford of Indiana LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00271
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The court DENIES the motion to proceed in forma pauperis (3); DIRECTS the clerk to place this cause number on a Pro Se 14 (INND Rev. 2/20) Prisoner Complaint and an AO 240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) Prisoner Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and send them to Darrin S. Shinkle; GRANTS Darrin S. Shinkle until 6/30/2021 to properly complete and file those forms with a copy of his inmate trust fund ledger detailing his transactions for the past six months; and CAUTIONS Darrin S. Shinkle if he does not file a complaint by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A because he has not filed a complaint which states a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/4/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms)(bas)
May 27, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Darrin S Shinkle. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (nal)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION and ORDER: The Court DENIES the motion for preliminary injunction #1 , GRANTS Darrin S. Shinkle until 05/26/2021, to file a complaint on a Prisoner Complaint Pro Se 14 (INND Rev. 2/20) form, along with either the filing fee or a Prisoner Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis AO 240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) accompanied by his trust fund ledgers for the past six months and CAUTIONS Darrin S. Shinkle that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 04/26/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (edb)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Darrin S Shinkle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shinkle v. Wexford of Indiana LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford of Indiana LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin S Shinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?