Jacquay v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kristine M. Jacquay
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00285
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FULL CONSENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is fully consented to Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. (kms)
June 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE: Counsel for Kristine M. Jacquay was directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #7 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. As required by General Order 2020-27, Counsel for Kristine M. Jacquay shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Counsel also advised of 10-day consent deadline by correspondence. (kms)
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Kristine M. Jacquay. Commissioner of Social Security (AUSA) served on 5/11/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (jld)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 6/1/2021. (tc)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS)(bas)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVING payment of the filing fee; and DIRECTING, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 4/28/2021. (cc: USMS)(bas)
April 26, 2021 Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (NEW CASE; IFP MOTION PENDING) (bas)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Fisher on behalf of Kristine M. Jacquay (Fisher, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (28 U.S.C. 1915) by Plaintiff Kristine M. Jacquay. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Fisher, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Kristine M. Jacquay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Fisher, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacquay v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine M. Jacquay
Represented By: Jennifer L Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?