Caldwell v. M.C.F
Plaintiff: James Clarence Ross Caldwell
Defendant: M.C.F.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00361
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (lhc)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER: The court DISMISSES this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A because the complaint does not state a claim. The clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 6/2/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVING the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING the plaintiff, James Clarence Ross Caldwell, IDOC # 156315, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the Clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTING the Clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTING the Clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 5/20/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se and Miami CF Trust Fund Acct.)(mrm)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The clerk is DIRECTED to close this case and open a new case with these filings in the South Bend Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 5/19/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(bas)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Defendant James Clarence Ross Caldwell. (lhc)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against M.C.F., filed by James Clarence Ross Caldwell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lhc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. M.C.F
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.C.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Clarence Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?