Hostetler v. Thackray et al
Plaintiff: Franklin J Hostetler
Defendant: John Thackray, MSA Safety Sales, LLC, MSA Safety, Inc. and MSA Innovation, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00401
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by John Thackray.(Rocap, Richard) Modified on 7/29/2021 (kms).
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by MSA Innovation, LLC.(Paige, Pamela)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MSA Innovation, LLC, filed by Franklin J Hostetler.(Drayton, V)
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Request for Jury Trial by John Thackray.(Rocap, Richard)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the instant Joint Motion #8 . Plaintiff is ORDERED to separately file an amended complaint no later than 7/14/2021 as outlined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/7/2021. (bas)
July 6, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by Defendants MSA Safety Sales, LLC, MSA Safety, Inc.. (Paige, Pamela)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer John Thackray answer due 7/12/2021. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/18/21. (slm)
June 18, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant John Thackray. (Rocap, Richard)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A Rocap on behalf of John Thackray (Rocap, Richard)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by V Michael Drayton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Drayton, V)
June 7, 2021 **New case** Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (kms)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela A Paige on behalf of MSA Safety Sales, LLC, MSA Safety, Inc. (Paige, Pamela)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4593783.) from LaPorte County Circuit Court, Cause No. 46C01-2104-CT-000867, filed by MSA Safety, Inc., MSA Safety Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Paige, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hostetler v. Thackray et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thackray
Represented By: Richard A Rocap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSA Safety Sales, LLC
Represented By: Pamela A Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSA Safety, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela A Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSA Innovation, LLC
Represented By: Pamela A Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin J Hostetler
Represented By: V Michael Drayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?