Restivo et al v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rose B Restivo and Angelo S Restivo
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00484
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bolden, Erin)
August 25, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Mae Douglass on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Douglass, Sara)
August 10, 2021 Filing 18 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 8/30/2021. Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2021 11:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/10/21. (slm) (cc Gills)Modified on 8/10/2021 (slm).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lamont P Domingue terminated. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/22/21. (slm)
July 22, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thor Motor Coach Inc re #14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Domingue, Lamont)
July 22, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Thor Motor Coach Inc. (Domingue, Lamont)
July 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin V Bolden on behalf of Thor Motor Coach Inc (Bolden, Erin)
July 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of Thor Motor Coach Inc (Gasper, Trevor)
July 2, 2021 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:21-cv-00194. Original file and docket sheet received.
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/2/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Transferring Case to the Northern District of Indiana. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/1/2021. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/2/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 Consent of the Parties to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Indiana by Angelo S Restivo, Rose B Restivo. (Gills, Nadine) Modified on 5/19/2021 to edit the text (NLT). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/2/2021.]
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Removing Defendant and List of Documents Included in the State Court Record by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Petition, #2 Attachment Affidavit of Service on Thor, #3 Attachment Notice of Removal to State Court & Counsel)(Domingue, Lamont) Modified on 4/26/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/2/2021.]
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 25 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 10 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/2/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries Inc for Thor Motor Coach, Inc... (Domingue, Lamont) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/2/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana by Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mark D. Stanley, #2 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue)(Domingue, Lamont) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/2/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Thor Motor Coach, Inc..(Domingue, Lamont) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/2/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number C-705288. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2271179), filed by Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Mark Stanley, #3 Exhibit 3 Counsel List, #4 Exhibit 4 Verification of Counsel, #5 Exhibit 5 Notice of Removal to State Court & Counsel, #6 Attachment 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Domingue, Lamont) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/2/2021.]
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Thor Motor Coach Inc, filed by Rose B Restivo, Angelo S Restivo.(jld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Restivo et al v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose B Restivo
Represented By: Nadine Gills
Represented By: Sara Mae Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo S Restivo
Represented By: Nadine Gills
Represented By: Sara Mae Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach Inc
Represented By: Lamont P Domingue
Represented By: Erin V Bolden
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?