Johnson Controls Technology Company v. Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc
Plaintiff: Johnson Controls Technology Company
Defendant: Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc dba KMC Controls Inc and Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc an Indiana corporation doing business as KMC Controls Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00501
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 18 Defendant Kreuter Manufacturing Co., Inc. d/b/a KMC Controls, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial by Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc.(Boylan PHV, Kristine)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Frank A Angileri PHV for Johnson Controls Technology Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/30/2021. (ace)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kristine M Boylan PHV for Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/18/2021. (ace)
August 17, 2021 Filing 15 Application for Attorney Kristine M. Boylan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kreuter Manufacturing Co., Inc. d/b/a KMC Controls, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4658983(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney O Joseph Balthazor PHV, Jr for Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/17/2021. (ace)
August 6, 2021 Filing 13 Application for Attorney O. Joseph Balthazor to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kreuter Manufacturing Co., Inc. d/b/a KMC Controls, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4650529(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2021: #1 MN Certificate) (ace).
August 5, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc. (Etienne, William)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William M Etienne on behalf of Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc (Etienne, William)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A Shuster on behalf of Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc (Shuster, Elizabeth)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Defendant ORDERED to file corporate disclosure statement under Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 within 7 days. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 8/2/2021. (nae)(order mailed to atty Shuster)
August 2, 2021 Set Deadlines. Per #7 Defendant Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc answer due 9/3/21. (nal)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 Application for Attorney Frank A. Angileri to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Johnson Controls Technology Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4644758(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2021: #1 SCOTUS Certificate) (ace).
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc ; answer due by September 3, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Extension Agreement)(Shuster, Elizabeth)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnson Controls Technology Company. Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Lorelli PHV, Marc)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Marc Lorelli PHV for Johnson Controls Technology Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/15/2021. (ace)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
July 14, 2021 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING) (rmc)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson Controls Technology Company identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Johnson Controls Technology Company.. (Lorelli PHV, Marc)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 Application for Attorney Marc Lorelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Johnson Controls Technology Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4626691 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lorelli PHV, Marc)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc dba KMC Controls Inc( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4626645.), filed by Johnson Controls Technology Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USPN 11,022,332, #2 Exhibit B - USPN 10,684,029, #3 Exhibit C - USPN 10,528,013, #4 Exhibit D - USPN 8,826,165, #5 Exhibit E - USPN 8,190,728, #6 Exhibit F - USPN D788,785, #7 Exhibit G - USPN D924,888, #8 Exhibit H - USPN D924,890, #9 Exhibit I - Claim Chart for 11,022,332, #10 Exhibit J - Claim Chart for 10,684,029, #11 Exhibit K - Claim Chart for 10,528,013, #12 Exhibit L - Claim Chart for 8,826,165, #13 Exhibit M - Claim Chart for 8,190,728, #14 Exhibit N - Claim Chart for D788,785, #15 Exhibit O - Claim Chart for D924,888, #16 Exhibit P - Claim Chart for D924,890, #17 Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Proposed Summons, #19 Patent Report)(Lorelli PHV, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson Controls Technology Company v. Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Controls Technology Company
Represented By: Marc Lorelli PHV
Represented By: Frank A Angileri PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc dba KMC Controls Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kreuter Manufacturing Co Inc an Indiana corporation doing business as KMC Controls Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth A Shuster
Represented By: Kristine M Boylan PHV
Represented By: O Joseph Balthazor PHV, Jr
Represented By: William M Etienne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?