Housley v. Meyers RV Centers LLC
Plaintiff: Leah Housley and Michael Housley
Defendant: Meyers RV Centers, LLC doing business as Camping World RV Sales - Apollo
Case Number: 3:2021cv00569
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
2 Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ***ALL FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE MADE ONLY ON THE LEAD DOCKET CASE NUMBER 3:21-cv-133*** ORDER GRANTING #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. The 3:21-cv-569 Case is CONSOLIDATED for all purposes into the earlier filed 3:21-cv-133 Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42 and N.D. Ind. L.R. 42-2. All filings shall be filed only in the 3:21-cv-133 Case going forward. Future filings in the 3:21-cv-569 Case will be stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/20/2021. (mrm)
August 20, 2021 Judge Damon R Leichty added. Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio no longer assigned to case due to Consolidation. (mrm)
August 17, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE by Meyers RV Centers, LLC for Motion for Consolidation (Bolden, Erin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin V Bolden on behalf of Meyers RV Centers, LLC (Bolden, Erin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of Meyers RV Centers, LLC (Gasper, Trevor)
August 5, 2021 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-00270. Original file and docket sheet received.
August 4, 2021 Case electronically transferred to District of Indiana Northern. (cel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Based upon the parties' stipulation #18 , this case will be transferred to the Northern District of Indiana, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/3/2021. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
August 2, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION Consent and Stipulation to Transfer by LEAH HOUSLEY, MICHAEL HOUSLEY. (Wells, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.] Modified on 8/5/2021 (jld).
July 7, 2021 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: Oral Argument held on 7/7/2021. Motions to Transfer and Consolidate taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Marsia Balobek) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ahern Wells on behalf of LEAH HOUSLEY, MICHAEL HOUSLEY. (Wells, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Oral Argument re-set from for 6/29/2021 to 7/7/2021 at 09:30 AM via Video Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. A video conference link will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/14/2021. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Continue Motion to Continue Oral Argument by LEAH HOUSLEY, MICHAEL HOUSLEY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Burdge, Ronald) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER Oral Argument on Defendant's Motion to Extend Time, Transfer Venue and Consolidate #8 is set for 6/29/2021 at 01:00 PM via Video Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Counsel will receive a video link by email. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/10/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond or Otherwise Plead, Motion to Transfer Venue, and Motion to Consolidate filed by LEAH HOUSLEY, MICHAEL HOUSLEY. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit Sales Agreement, #3 Exhibit Limited Warranty, #4 Exhibit Michael Housley Affidavit, #5 Proposed Order) (Burdge, Ronald) Modified on 5/13/2021 (cel). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/11/2021. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of 10 Pages in Response to Defendant Meyer RV Centers, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, To Transfer Venue and To Consolidate by LEAH HOUSLEY, MICHAEL HOUSLEY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Burdge, Ronald) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Upon review of Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint #8 , it is hereby ordered that the time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is STAYED untilsuch time as the issues of transfer and consolidation are ruled upon. Plaintiffs are directed to respond to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Consolidate #8 on or before May 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/28/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
April 27, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support re #8 Motion to Extend Time , Transfer Venue and Consolidate filed by MEYERS RV CENTERS, LLC. (Custer, Paul) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond or Otherwise Plead by MEYERS RV CENTERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indiana Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - National Judicial Caseload, #3 Proposed Service Order) (Custer, Paul). Added MOTION to Change Venue, MOTION to Consolidate Cases on 5/13/2021 (cel). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R. Smith on behalf of MEYERS RV CENTERS, LLC. (Smith, Timothy) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Alexander Custer on behalf of MEYERS RV CENTERS, LLC. (Custer, Paul) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LEAH HOUSLEY, MICHAEL HOUSLEY. MEYERS RV CENTERS, LLC waiver sent on 2/26/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. (Burdge, Ronald) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jgb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/2/2021. (jgb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MEYERS RV CENTERS, LLC (cel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MEYERS RV CENTERS, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6371237), filed by LEAH HOUSLEY, MICHAEL HOUSLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 8/5/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Housley v. Meyers RV Centers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Housley
Represented By: Elizabeth Ahern Wells
Represented By: Ronald Burdge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Housley
Represented By: Elizabeth Ahern Wells
Represented By: Ronald Burdge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meyers RV Centers, LLC doing business as Camping World RV Sales - Apollo
Represented By: Paul Alexander Custer
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Represented By: Erin V Bolden
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?