Brown v. WellPet LLC
Plaintiff: James Brown
Defendant: WellPet LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00576
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Laura L Sheets PHV for James Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/29/2021. (ace)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lance T Spitzig PHV for James Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/29/2021. (ace)
September 29, 2021 Filing 13 Application for Attorney Steven D. Liddle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Brown. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4701637(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 12 Application for Attorney Lance T. Spitzig to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Brown. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4701634(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 11 Application for Attorney Laura L. Sheets to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Brown. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4701492(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
September 14, 2021 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 10/4/2021. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2021 11:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/14/21. (slm)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 (Defendant's Answer and Additional Defenses to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint) ANSWER to Complaint by WellPet LLC.(Maley, John)
August 5, 2021 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (bas)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles M Denton, II on behalf of WellPet LLC (Denton, Charles)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E Brown on behalf of WellPet LLC (Brown, Sarah)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S Bergerson, Jr on behalf of WellPet LLC (Bergerson, Michael)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WellPet LLC identifying Corporate Parent WellPet LLC, Other Affiliate Clearlake Capital Group, L.P. for WellPet LLC.. (Maley, John)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Maley on behalf of WellPet LLC (Maley, John)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4649249.) from St. Joseph County Superior Court 5, Cause No. 71D05-2106-CT-000222, filed by WellPet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Case Filings (All), #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Fuehrer v. Nestle Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Ooley v. Eco-Tech Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maley, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. WellPet LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brown
Represented By: Kara A Bekelya
Represented By: Lance T Spitzig PHV
Represented By: Laura L Sheets PHV
Represented By: Marshall P Whalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WellPet LLC
Represented By: Charles M Denton, II
Represented By: Michael S Bergerson, Jr
Represented By: Sarah E Brown
Represented By: John R Maley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?