Bubbles Ice Cream Parlor & Pie Shoppe, Inc. v. Scoops & Sweet Bubbles, LLC
Plaintiff: Bubbles Ice Cream Parlor & Pie Shoppe, Inc.
Defendant: Scoops & Sweet Bubbles, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00634
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Scoops & Sweet Bubbles, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Jurisdiction)(Overhauser, Paul)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian N Anderson PHV for Bubbles Ice Cream Parlor & Pie Shoppe, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/24/2021. (ace)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion #7 . The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED until 10/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/23/2021. (bas)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 Application for Attorney Brian N. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bubbles Ice Cream Parlor & Pie Shoppe, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4680071(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Defendant Scoops & Sweet Bubbles, LLC. (Overhauser, Paul)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scoops & Sweet Bubbles, LLC. (Overhauser, Paul)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B Overhauser on behalf of Scoops & Sweet Bubbles, LLC (Overhauser, Paul)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Scoops & Sweet Bubbles, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk)
August 26, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (shk)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bubbles Ice Cream Parlor & Pie Shoppe, Inc.. (Hood, Gary)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary E Hood on behalf of Bubbles Ice Cream Parlor & Pie Shoppe, Inc. (Hood, Gary)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Scoops & Sweet Bubbles, LLC( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4667605.), filed by Bubbles Ice Cream Parlor & Pie Shoppe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Hood, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bubbles Ice Cream Parlor & Pie Shoppe, Inc. v. Scoops & Sweet Bubbles, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bubbles Ice Cream Parlor & Pie Shoppe, Inc.
Represented By: Gary E Hood
Represented By: Brian N Anderson PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scoops & Sweet Bubbles, LLC
Represented By: Paul B Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?