Forest River, Inc. v. inTech Trailers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Forest River, Inc.
Defendant: inTech Trailers, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00645
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bautista, Philip)
October 12, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (and Affirmative Defenses) by inTech Trailers, Inc.. (Fountain, Ryan)
September 29, 2021 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 10/20/2021. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2021 11:15 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/29/21. (slm)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by inTech Trailers, Inc.. (Fountain, Ryan)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defense by inTech Trailers, Inc..(Fountain, Ryan)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M Fountain on behalf of All Defendants (Fountain, Ryan)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Forest River, Inc.. inTech Trailers, Inc. served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Bautista, Philip)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to inTech Trailers, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kms)
September 1, 2021 **New case** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (kms)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy N Betz-Sandifur on behalf of Forest River, Inc. (Betz-Sandifur, Tracy)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Forest River, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Forest River, Inc... (Bautista, Philip)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against inTech Trailers, Inc.( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4672244.), filed by Forest River, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DELLA TERRA - Certificate of Registration, #2 Exhibit B - MOUNTAIN DESIGN - Certificate of Registration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons upon inTech Trailers, Inc.)(Bautista, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forest River, Inc. v. inTech Trailers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forest River, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy N Betz-Sandifur
Represented By: Philip R Bautista
Represented By: Tracy N Betz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: inTech Trailers, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan M Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?