Graham v. Irish Realty
Plaintiff: DeAnn G Graham
Defendant: Irish Realty
Case Number: 3:2021cv00750
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 APPELLANT's-PLAINTIFF"S MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff DeAnn G Graham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jld) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2021: #2 Page 2 of Motion with signature) (kms). Modified on 11/30/2021 (kms).
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Irish Realty.(Hardman, Lyle)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Irish Realty. (Hardman, Lyle)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lyle R Hardman on behalf of Irish Realty (Hardman, Lyle)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo DeAnn G Graham. Irish Realty served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (bas)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Irish Realty. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (cc: USMS) (lhc)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 ; WAIVES payment of the filing fee; and DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 10/29/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party and USM)(lhc)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff DeAnn G Graham. (jld)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Irish Realty, filed by DeAnn G Graham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Plaintiff's Demand Letter for Settlement Agreement, #3 Proposed Summons & USM-285)(jld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Irish Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeAnn G Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irish Realty
Represented By: Lyle R Hardman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?