Neal v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Marcia D Neal
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00771
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE: Marcia D Neal was directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #4 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. As required by General Order 2020-27, Marcia D Neal shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Pro Se Party also advised of 10-day deadline by phone and standard mail. (kms)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/5/2021. cc: prose plf (slm) Modified on 10/22/2021 (slm).
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RECEIPT of duplicate copy of DE #1 Complaint (missing page 3) from Marcia D Neal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 USM 285 Form, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Envelope)(kms)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Marcia D Neal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons & USM-285, #4 Envelope) (NEW CASE, NO IFP FILED)(jld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia D Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?