Evans v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jackie Sue Evans
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00845
Filed: October 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Russell, Mary Ellen)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ellen Russell on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Russell, Mary Ellen)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William C Lee for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 12/16/2021. (lns)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail., Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (jdb)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order **NEW CASE** Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (jdb)
October 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4732073.), filed by Jackie Sue Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Chermol, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Sue Evans
Represented By: David F Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Mary Ellen Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?