Norwood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bryant P. Norwood and Bryant P Norwood
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00849
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE: Counsel for Bryant P Norwood was directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #9 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. As required by General Order 2020-27, Counsel for Bryant P Norwood shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Counsel also advised of 10-day consent deadline by correspondence. (kms)
December 13, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Bryant P Norwood. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/3/2021, US Attorney General and US Attorney served on 12/2/2021, answer due 1/31/2022. (mrm)
December 10, 2021 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/27/2021. (slm)
December 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS)(mrm)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The payment of the filing fee is WAIVED. The US Marshals Service is DIRECTED to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 11/3/2021. (cc: USMS)(mrm)
November 2, 2021 **NEW CASE** **MOTION PENDING** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (nhc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann E Young on behalf of Bryant P. Norwood (Young, Ann)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S Rodman on behalf of Bryant P. Norwood (Rodman, Jason)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Randal S Forbes on behalf of Bryant P. Norwood (Forbes, Randal)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Bryant P. Norwood. (Forbes, Randal)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Review Decision of Commissioner of Social Security Administration against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Bryant P. Norwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Forbes, Randal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norwood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant P. Norwood
Represented By: Ann E Young
Represented By: Jason S Rodman
Represented By: Randal S Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant P Norwood
Represented By: Ann E Young
Represented By: Jason S Rodman
Represented By: Randal S Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?