Eslick v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Ryan L. Eslick
Defendant: Davis, Knockie and Jones
Case Number: 3:2021cv00866
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: South Bend Office
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Correctional Officer Davis, Correctional Officer Knockie, Sergeant Jones. Waiver of Service due by 12/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Opinion and Order, #2 Complaint) (lhc)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER: The court DENIES Ryan L. Eslick's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction #4 ; GRANTS Ryan L. Eslick leave to proceed against Correctional Officer Davis in his individual capacity for compensatory and punitive damages for assaulting him on or about June 23, 2021, in violation of the Eighth Amendment; GRANTS Ryan L. Eslick leave to proceed against Correctional Officer Knockie and Sergeant Jones in their individual capacities for compensatory and punitive damages for failing to intervene when Correctional Officer Davis assaulted Eslick on or about June 23, 2021, in violation of the Eighth Amendment; DISMISSES all other claims; DIRECTS the clerk to request Waiver of Service from (and if necessary, the United States Marshals Service to serve process on) Correctional Officer Davis, Correctional Officer Knockie, and Sergeant Jones at the Indiana Department of Correction, with a copy of this order and the complaint #1 , under 28 U.S.C. 1915(d); ORDERS the Indiana Department of Correction to provide the full name, date of birth, and last known home address of any defendant who does not waive service if it has such information; and ORDERS, under 42 U.S.C. 1997e(g)(2), Correctional Officer Davis, Correctional Officer Knockie, and Sergeant Jones to respond, as provided for in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and N.D. Ind. L.R. 10-1(b), only to the claims for which the plaintiff has been granted leave to proceed in this screening order. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 11/12/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTS #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERS the plaintiff, Ryan L. Eslick, IDOC # 121550, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $48.78 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 11/9/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Inmate Trust Fund Dept)(lhc)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to close case 2:21cv345 and open a new case with these filings in the South Bend Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/9/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Ryan L. Eslick. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction). (nhc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for the Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Ryan L. Eslick. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Counsel)(nhc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Ryan L. Eslick. (nhc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Davis, Jones, Knockie, filed by Ryan L. Eslick. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (nhc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eslick v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan L. Eslick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Represented By: Conner R Dickerson
Represented By: Virginia T Marso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knockie
Represented By: Conner R Dickerson
Represented By: Virginia T Marso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Represented By: Conner R Dickerson
Represented By: Virginia T Marso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?