Figueredo v. Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.
Plaintiff: Manuel Figueredo
Defendant: Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00966
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The court ORDERS defendant to file disclosure statement under FRCP 7.1 within 7 days. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 2/23/22. (dk)
February 22, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hoffer, Brian)
January 20, 2022 Set Deadline per #5 Agreed Notice. Defendant Gulf Stream Coach, Inc. answer due by 2/22/2022. (mrm)
January 20, 2022 Filing 5 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Gulf Stream Coach, Inc. ; answer due by February 22, 2022. (Hoffer, Brian)
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy J Spitaels on behalf of Gulf Stream Coach, Inc. (Spitaels, Randy)
January 17, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L Hoffer on behalf of Gulf Stream Coach, Inc. (Hoffer, Brian)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gulf Stream Coach, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
December 29, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (jdb)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4789125.), filed by Manuel Figueredo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Dalton, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Figueredo v. Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Figueredo
Represented By: Richard C Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Brian L Hoffer
Represented By: Randy J Spitaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?