Beavers v. Warden
Petitioner: Cory Beavers
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 3:2021cv00974
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2018-2 from Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr and Judge Damon R Leichty to Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. (kms)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #9 Amended MOTION to Sever Disciplinary Cases by Respondent Warden; DIRECTING the clerk to indicate on the electronic docket that this case pertains solely to ISP-21-3-120; DIRECTING the clerk to file the amended petition #4 and this order in a new case and to indicate on the electronic docket that the case pertains to ISP 21-3-121; DIRECTING the clerk to file the amended petition #4 and this order in a second new case and to indicate on the electronic docket that the case pertains to ISP 21-4-129; DIRECTING the clerk to file the amended petition #4 and this order in a third new case and to indicate on the electronic docket that the case pertains to ISP-21-4-130; GRANTING Cory Beavers until 3/28/2022, to resolve his filing fee status in this case; and CAUTIONING Cory Beavers that, if he does not respond by that deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/24/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
February 23, 2022 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to #9 Amended MOTION to Sever Disciplinary Cases Exhibit C-2-Screening Report, case 129 filed by Warden. (Arthur, David)
February 23, 2022 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to #9 Amended MOTION to Sever Disciplinary Cases Exhibit E-DCAO filed by Warden. (Arthur, David)
February 23, 2022 Filing 9 Amended MOTION to Sever Disciplinary Cases by Respondent Warden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1-Conduct Report, case 120.pdf, #2 Exhibit A-2-Screening, case 120.pdf, #3 Exhibit A-3-Report of disciplinary hearing, case 120.pdf, #4 Exhibit A-4-Facility Appeal, Case 120.pdf, #5 Exhibit A-5-Appeal review officer, case 120.pdf, #6 Exhibit B-1-Conduct Report, case 121.pdf, #7 Exhibit B-2-Screening, case 121.pdf, #8 Exhibit B-3-Report of Disciplinary Hearing, case 121.pdf, #9 Exhibit B-4-Facility Appeal, case 121.pdf, #10 Exhibit B-5-Appeal Review Officer, case 121.pdf, #11 Exhibit C-1-Conduct report, case129.pdf, #12 Exhibit C-2-Appeal review officer, case 129.pdf, #13 Exhibit C-3-Report of Disciplinary hearing, case 129.pdf, #14 Exhibit C-4-Facility appeal, case 129.pdf, #15 Exhibit C-5-Appeal Review Officer, case 129.pdf, #16 Exhibit D-1-Conduct Report, case 130.pdf, #17 Exhibit D-2-Screening, case 130.pdf, #18 Exhibit D-3-Report of disciplinary hearing, case 130.pdf, #19 Exhibit D-4-Facility Appeal, case 130.pdf, #20 Exhibit D-5-Appeal review officer, case 130.pdf)(Arthur, David)
February 1, 2022 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (Copy mailed to pro se party). Magistrate Consent forms due by 2/22/2022. (slm)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court DENIES the motion to sever #5 ; and GRANTS the Warden until February 25, 2022, to refile a motion to sever consistent with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/25/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(shk)
January 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David A Arthur on behalf of Warden (Arthur, David)
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Sever Disciplinary Cases by Respondent Warden. (Arthur, David)
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Cory Beavers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(nae)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Cory Beavers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(kms)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Pursuant to Section 2254 Habeas Corpus Rule 5, the respondent is ORDERED to enter an appearance by 1/31/2022, and file a response to the petition with the entire administrative record by 3/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/10/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Warden)(lhc)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Cory Beavers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(No filing fee or IFP received)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Beavers)(kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beavers v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cory Beavers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: David A Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?