Hall v. Kosciusko Co Jail Staff
Plaintiff: Trey A Hall
Defendant: Kosciusko Co Jail Staff
Case Number: 3:2022cv00004
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING the clerk to place this cause number on a blank Pro Se 14 (INND Rev. 2/20) Prisoner Complaint form and send it to Trey A. Hall; GRANTING Trey A. Hall until 3/25/2022, to file a signed, amended complaint on the form provided; and CAUTIONING Trey A. Hall that, if he does not file an amended complaint by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/28/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(asd)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Trey A Hall from Kosciusko County Jail to Reception Diagnostic Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(kms)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 22.40, receipt number 3028556. (kms)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 ; ORDERS the plaintiff, Trey A. Hall, IDOC # 286299, Kosciusko County Jail # 60704, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $22.40 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 02/11/2022. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) (jdb)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis titled as Motion to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Trey A Hall. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis, #2 Inmate Trust Fund Account Ledger)(nae)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court DIRECTS the clerk to place this cause number on a blank Pro Se 14 (INND Rev.2/20) Prisoner Complaint form and a blank Prisoner Motion to Proceed In FormaPauperis AO240 (Rev. 7/10)(INND Rev. 8/16) form and send them to Trey A. Hall, GRANTS Trey A. Hall until 2/10/22 to file a signed, amended complaint on the form provided and resolve his filing fee status by either paying the filing fee or filing a signed motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with a copy of his inmate trust fund ledger detailing his transactions for the past six months and CAUTIONS him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may bedismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 1/7/22. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nal)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (Unsigned) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Trey A Hall. (kms)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Kosciusko Co Jail Staff, filed by Trey A Hall. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Hall)(kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Kosciusko Co Jail Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trey A Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kosciusko Co Jail Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?