Payne v. Kern
Plaintiff: Marshall Payne
Defendant: Dustin Kern
Case Number: 3:2022cv00009
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (lhc)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 2/24/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
January 13, 2022 Filing 3 (Unsigned) Letter from Marshall Payne re: defendant Kern. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kms)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The clerk is DIRECTED to place this cause number on a Pro Se 14 (INND Rev. 2/20) Prisoner Complaint form and send it to Marshall Payne who is CAUTIONED if he does not file a complaint by February 14, 2022, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/11/22. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(ksp)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Marshall Payne. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(No Complaint form received)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Payne)(kms) Modified on 1/5/2022 (kms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?