Mullenhour v. Penn Central Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Richard L. Mullenhour
Defendant: Penn Central Corporation, Consolidated Rail Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company and American Premier Underwriters Inc
Case Number: 3:2022cv00032
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth R Cloyd on behalf of Richard L. Mullenhour (Cloyd, Kenneth)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint #1 is extended to 4/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/8/2022. (nhc)
March 7, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H Harrison, III on behalf of Penn Central Corporation (Harrison, Joseph)
March 7, 2022 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Penn Central Corporation. (Loftus, Barry)
March 7, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Penn Central Corporation. (Loftus, Barry)
March 7, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry L Loftus on behalf of Penn Central Corporation (Loftus, Barry)
March 7, 2022 Set Deadlines: Penn Central Corporation Answer due 3/9/2022 pursuant to DE #12 . (kms)
March 4, 2022 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Richard L. Mullenhour. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pfeifer, Daniel)
March 4, 2022 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Richard L. Mullenhour. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pfeifer, Daniel)
March 3, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Consolidated Rail Corporation Answer due 4/12/2022 pursuant to DE #9 . (kms)
March 2, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H Harrison, III on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation (Harrison, Joseph)
March 2, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Consolidated Rail Corporation. (Loftus, Barry)
March 2, 2022 Filing 9 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Consolidated Rail Corporation ; answer due by April 12, 2022. (Loftus, Barry)
March 2, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry L Loftus on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation (Loftus, Barry)
March 2, 2022 Filing 7 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Consolidated Rail Corporation. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm)
March 1, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons filed by Richard L. Mullenhour. (Pfeifer, Daniel)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Penn Central Corporation. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk) Modified on to update title 3/2/2022 (mrm).
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by Richard L. Mullenhour. (Pfeifer, Daniel)
January 18, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Consolidated Rail Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Penn Central Corporation. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
January 18, 2022 **NEW CASE** Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (jdb)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel H Pfeifer on behalf of Richard L. Mullenhour (Pfeifer, Daniel)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Mullenhour against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4804932.), filed by Richard L. Mullenhour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 **Atty Error**Proposed Summons, #3 **Atty Error**Proposed Summons, #4 **Atty Error**Proposed Summons)(Pfeifer, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2022: #6 Corrected Proposed Summons-Penn Central, #7 Corrected Proposed Summons-CRC, #8 Corrected Proposed Summons-Norfolk) (jdb). Modified on 1/18/2022 (jdb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullenhour v. Penn Central Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L. Mullenhour
Represented By: Daniel H Pfeifer
Represented By: Kenneth R Cloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn Central Corporation
Represented By: Barry L Loftus
Represented By: Joseph H Harrison, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Rail Corporation
Represented By: Barry L Loftus
Represented By: Joseph H Harrison, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Premier Underwriters Inc
Represented By: Joseph H Harrison, III
Represented By: Barry L Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?