Lewis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Dinaireal Lewis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2022cv00242
Filed: March 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2020-27 from Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr and Judge Philip P Simon to Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. (kms)
May 4, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dinaireal Lewis. Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/11/2022, answer due 6/10/2022. (Forbes, Randal)
April 22, 2022 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/6/2022. (slm)
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Irvin AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Irvin AUSA, Brian)
March 28, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (jld)
March 28, 2022 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
March 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann E Young on behalf of Dinaireal Lewis (Young, Ann)
March 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S Rodman on behalf of Dinaireal Lewis (Rodman, Jason)
March 27, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Randal S Forbes on behalf of Dinaireal Lewis (Forbes, Randal)
March 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Review Decision of Commissioner of Social Security Administration against Commissioner of Social Security( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4871988.), filed by Dinaireal Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Forbes, Randal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinaireal Lewis
Represented By: Ann E Young
Represented By: Jason S Rodman
Represented By: Randal S Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Brian Irvin - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?