Smith v. South Bend Indiana States Attorneys Office et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Lee Smith
Defendant: South Bend Indiana States Attorneys Office, Kenneth Biggins, State of Indiana and St Joseph County Jail
Case Number: 3:2022cv00301
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Filing 11 Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 140.20, receipt number INN4000489. (ksp)
April 22, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (copy to pro se party) (mlc)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE as malicious pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 4/22/22. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mlc)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff, Aaron Lee Smith, Indiana Department of Correction # 199055, Illinois Department of Correction # Y25274, St. Joseph County Jail # 127605, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $140.20 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The clerk is DIRECTED to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 4/22/22. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Shawnee Correctional Center)(mlc) Modified on 4/25/2022 to add routing (mlc).
April 20, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response to be filed by 5/24/2022 (sej)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Aaron Lee Smith, a prisoner without a lawyer, filed this lawsuit, but did not pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis motion. If he wants to continue this lawsuit, he must resolve his filing fee status either by paying the filing fee or filing an in forma pauperis motion with a copy of his inmate trust fund ledger detailing his transactions for the past six months.For these reasons, Aaron Lee Smith is GRANTED until May 24, 2022, to respond to this order and CAUTIONED if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 04/20/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(sej)
April 18, 2022 Filing 6 NEW CASE transferred in from Southern district of Illinois. (No IFP, Filing Fee not paid). (jld)
April 18, 2022 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:22-cv-00732. Original file and docket sheet received.
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Northern District of Indiana - South Bend Division. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/15/2022. (jsy) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/18/2022.]
April 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 04/14/2022. Consent due by 5/5/2022 (kare) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/18/2022.]
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 22-732-JPG. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/14/2022. (kare) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/18/2022.]
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Aaron Lee Smith.(kare) (kare). [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 4/18/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. South Bend Indiana States Attorneys Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Lee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Bend Indiana States Attorneys Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Biggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Joseph County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?