Perry v. Neal et al
Plaintiff: Rodney S Perry, Sr
Defendant: Ron Neal, Debra Abrams and Mark Newkirk
Not Classified By Court: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2022cv00308
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE to the Court re Initial Partial Filing Fee as Ordered by the Court by Rodney S Perry, Sr re #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(jdb)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Previously received) Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Rodney S Perry, Sr. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (jdb)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Rodney S. Perry Sr., by Rodney S Perry, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kms)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Previously received) Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Rodney S Perry, Sr. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (kms)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Partial Initial Filing fee: $ 10.00, receipt number 3029060 (nae)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (unsigned) Plaintiff's Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis without Pre Paying the Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Further Proceedings (Doc #4 ). (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached). by Plaintiff Rodney S Perry, Sr. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit). (nhc)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Previously received) Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (nhc)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court ORDERS the plaintiff, Rodney S. Perry, Sr., IDOC # 974441, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $62.00 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full, DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/6/22. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nal)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Debra Abrams, Ron Neal, Mark Newkirk, filed by Rodney S Perry, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kms)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Previously received) Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Rodney S Perry, Sr. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (kms)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Rodney S Perry, Sr. (nae)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Deficiency Deadline terminated. (nae)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Rodney S. Perry, Sr. is GRANTED until 5/19/22 to respond to this order and CAUTIONED that if he does not respond by the deadline this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/25/22. (nal)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Docket sheet and file stamped copy of Complaint to be distribute to Rodney S Perry Sr #974441. (Attachments: #1 File stamped copy of Complaint)(kms)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (Unsigned) PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Debra Abrams, Ron Neal, Mark Newkirk, filed by Rodney S Perry, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(No filing fee or IFP received)(kms) Modified on 4/20/2022 (kms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2022: #2 Corrected Complaint, #3 Corrected Exhibits) (kms).
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Rodney S Perry, Sr. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Neal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney S Perry, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Newkirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?