Chambers v. Kirby et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Chambers
Defendant: Kirby, Roseman and Sowards
Case Number: 3:2022cv00310
Filed: April 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to the Motion to Dismiss #4 and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 5/16/22. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ksp)
May 5, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Combine All Civil Right Cases and Dismissed Them All or Drop by Plaintiff Jerry Chambers. (nae)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 ; ORDERS the plaintiff, Jerry Chambers, IDOC # 210132, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $60.93 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 4/27/2022. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(shk)
April 19, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jerry Chambers. (kms)
April 19, 2022 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Kirby, Roseman, Sowards, filed by Jerry Chambers.(File stamped copy with case number sent to Chambers)(kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Kirby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sowards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?