Shank v. Sheriff
Petitioner: Curtis D Shank
Respondent: Sheriff
Case Number: 3:2022cv00314
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal; DENYING #7 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 05/04/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(sej)
May 2, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay by Petitioner Curtis D Shank. (Captioned with previous case number 4:22-cv-28) (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(jdb)
April 29, 2022 Filing 6 Letter from Curtis Shank captioned with previous case number 4:22-cv-28 regarding copies. (filing received on toilet paper) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (asd)
April 27, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Curtis D Shank. (state court case number on IFP) (ksp)
April 22, 2022 Filing 4 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The court DENIES the motion to stay and DIRECTS the clerk to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 4/22/22. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The clerk is DIRECTED to close this case and open a new case with these filings in the South Bend Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 4/20/2022. (Copy and docket sheet mailed to pro se party first class and certified mail #7018 1830 0001 3190 5371 as directed in Order). (nhc)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (titled, "Motion for a Stay 28USC18"), filed by Curtis D Shank. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibits, #3 Envelope) (No filing fee or IFP motion submitted; file-marked copy sent to pro se petitioner)(ksp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shank v. Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Curtis D Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?