Farris v. Miami Correctional Medical-Exc
Plaintiff: Jacob Walter Farris
Defendant: Miami Correctional Medical-Exc
Not Classified By Court: MIAMI E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2022cv00318
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Filing 8 Partial Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 0.21, receipt number 3029210 (jld)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court ORDERS the plaintiff, Jacob Walter Farris, IDOC # 268371, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $10.93 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full, DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/12/22. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nal)
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jacob Walter Farris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(asd)
May 2, 2022 Filing 5 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Jacob Walter Farris. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (ksp)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Jacob Walter Farris is GRANTED until 5/27/2022, to respond to this order and CAUTIONED if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/25/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to close this case and open a new case with these filings in the South Bend Division. New Case Number 3:22- cv-318, Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 04/22/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party with Docket Sheet) (jdb)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jacob Walter Farris. (mlc)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Miami Correctional Medical-Exc, filed by Jacob Walter Farris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farris v. Miami Correctional Medical-Exc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Walter Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Correctional Medical-Exc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MIAMI E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?