Espinoza v. Wisniewski et al
Plaintiff: Alberto Espinoza
Defendant: Jason Wisniewski, CO 1413, CO 1130, C.O. 1413 and C.O. 1130
Case Number: 3:2022cv00348
Filed: May 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (sej)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 06/27/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(sej)
May 23, 2022 Filing 7 Mail Returned from Alberto Espinoza #5 Order to Show Cause. Envelope marked as Return to Sender - Not in Custody - Released 5/5/22. (asd)
May 16, 2022 Filing 6 Mail Returned from Alberto Espinoza #3 Order. Envelope marked as Undeliverable - Not In Custody - Return to Sender - Released 5/5/22. (asd)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Alberto Espinoza is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE by 6/13/2022, why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). He is CAUTIONED if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/13/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
May 12, 2022 Filing 4 Mail Returned from Alberto Espinoza as Undeliverable - #1 Pro Se Complaint (Released from Custody 5/5/22). (jld)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Alberto Espinoza; ORDERING the plaintiff, Alberto Espinoza, IDOC # UNKNOWN, St. Joseph County Jail # 309276, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $23.90 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTING the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 05/05/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party and St. Joseph County Jail)(sej)
May 2, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Alberto Espinoza. (kms)
May 2, 2022 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against CO 1130, CO 1413, Jason Wisniewski, filed by Alberto Espinoza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Espinoza)(kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinoza v. Wisniewski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Espinoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO 1413
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO 1130
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. 1413
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. 1130
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?