Harper Trucks Inc v. Gleason Industrial Products Inc
Plaintiff: Harper Trucks Inc
Defendant: Gleason Industrial Products Inc
Case Number: 3:2022cv00566
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Gleason Industrial Products Inc. (Gruner, Anne)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Donald Jackson PHV for Harper Trucks Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/30/2022. (ace)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter W Gowdey PHV for Harper Trucks Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/30/2022. (ace)
August 30, 2022 Set Deadlines per #9 Gleason Industrial Products Inc answer due by 09/08/22. (nal)
August 29, 2022 Filing 9 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Gleason Industrial Products Inc ; answer due by 09/08/2022. (Gruner, Anne)
August 24, 2022 Filing 8 Application for Attorney Donald Lee Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Harper Trucks Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5004609 (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing)(Jackson, Donald)
August 24, 2022 Filing 7 Application for Attorney Peter Whitlock Gowdey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Harper Trucks Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5004408 (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing)(Gowdey, Peter)
July 20, 2022 Filing 6 AO 120 Form by Harper Trucks Inc on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Curran, Timothy) Modified on 7/20/2022 to update title (mrm).
July 20, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gleason Industrial Products Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm)
July 19, 2022 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. **NEW CASE** (mrm)
July 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J O'Rear on behalf of Harper Trucks Inc (O'Rear, Patrick)
July 19, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harper Trucks Inc. (Curran, Timothy)
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy M Curran on behalf of Harper Trucks Inc (Curran, Timothy)
July 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Gleason Industrial Products Inc( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4972996.), filed by Harper Trucks Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 933 patent, #2 Exhibit B - Claim 4 Chart, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Curran, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper Trucks Inc v. Gleason Industrial Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harper Trucks Inc
Represented By: Patrick J O'Rear
Represented By: Timothy M Curran
Represented By: Donald Jackson PHV
Represented By: Peter W Gowdey PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gleason Industrial Products Inc
Represented By: Anne A Gruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?