Perry v. Hawkins
Plaintiff: Rodney S Perry, Sr
Defendant: D Hawkins
Not Classified By Court: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2022cv00629
Filed: August 8, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Plaintiff's NOTICE to the Court Regarding This Court Opinion and Orders in Pursuant with 28 U.S.C. 1915A by Rodney S Perry, Sr. (kmt)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE to the Court Regarding Initial Partial Filing Fee as Ordered by the Court by Rodney S Perry, Sr. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit). (nhc)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (previously received) Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Rodney S Perry, Sr. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (nhc)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Partial Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 8.44, receipt number 3029715. (kmt)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court ORDERS the plaintiff, Rodney S. Perry, Sr., IDOC # 974441, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $56.67 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full, DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/19/22. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nal)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RECEIPT of additional exhibits from Rodney S Perry, Sr. (jld)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RECEIPT from Rodney S Perry, Sr. of previously filed consent to e-file. (jld)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Docket sheet and file stamped copy of Complaint to be distributed to Rodney S. Perry Sr. #974441. (Attachments: #1 File stamped copy of Complaint)(kmt)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Rodney S Perry, Sr. (kmt)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRO SE COMPLAINT against D Hawkins, filed by Rodney S Perry, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kmt)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Rodney S Perry, Sr. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney S Perry, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?