Murray v. American Licorice Co
Plaintiff: Dakota Murray
Defendant: American Licorice Co
Case Number: 3:2022cv00927
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice pursuant to #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 12/20/2022. (dk)
December 19, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dakota Murray (Baishnab, Robi)
November 22, 2022 Reset Deadlines: American Licorice Co Answer due 12/21/2022 pursuant to DE #7 . (kmt)
November 21, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Licorice Co. (Alcala, Brian)
November 21, 2022 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by American Licorice Co ; answer due by December 21, 2022. (Alcala, Brian)
November 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian V Alcala on behalf of American Licorice Co (Alcala, Brian)
November 15, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dakota Murray. American Licorice Co served on 11/11/2022, answer due 12/2/2022. (Baishnab, Robi)
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Dakota Murray of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Baishnab, Robi)
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Dakota Murray of Filing Consent to Join Forms Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms)(Baishnab, Robi)
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Licorice Co. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kmt)
November 7, 2022 **NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (kmt)
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Licorice Co( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5070727.), filed by Dakota Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Baishnab, Robi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. American Licorice Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota Murray
Represented By: Robi J Baishnab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Licorice Co
Represented By: Brian V Alcala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?