Jaquish v. Center for the Disadvantaged et al
Plaintiff: KELLY K. JAQUISH and Kelly K Jaquish
Defendant: CENTER FOR THE DISADVANTAGED, ROSALIE K. NORTHERN and Rosalie K Northern
Case Number: 3:2022cv01058
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Center for the Disadvantaged, Rosalie K Northern.(Perry, Benjamin)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 State Court Complaint All Defendants answer due 02/17/2023. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/6/23. (slm)
February 3, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 State Court Complaint by Defendants Center for the Disadvantaged, Rosalie K Northern. (Perry, Benjamin)
January 9, 2023 Answer deadline reset to 2/3/2023 pursuant to #5 initial unopposed extension of time filed by Defendants Center for the Disadvantaged and Rosalie K Northern. (shk)
January 5, 2023 Filing 5 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Center for the Disadvantaged, Rosalie K Northern ; answer due by February 3, 2023. (Perry, Benjamin)
January 3, 2023 **NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (kmt)
December 30, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR THE DISADVANTAGED. (Perry, Benjamin)
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin S Perry on behalf of CENTER FOR THE DISADVANTAGED, ROSALIE K. NORTHERN (Perry, Benjamin)
December 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5117362.) from St. Joseph Superior Court, Cause No. 71D06-2210-PL-000220, filed by ROSALIE K. NORTHERN, CENTER FOR THE DISADVANTAGED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perry, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaquish v. Center for the Disadvantaged et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY K. JAQUISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly K Jaquish
Represented By: Myra R Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTER FOR THE DISADVANTAGED
Represented By: Benjamin S Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSALIE K. NORTHERN
Represented By: Benjamin S Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosalie K Northern
Represented By: Benjamin S Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?